IN HB1311 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Election matters.
Title
Election matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Stoops), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Stoops), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 271 |
2013-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 563: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 362: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Stoops), rejected; Roll Call 338: yeas 12, nays 37 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Zakas), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment 3 (Head), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Head |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Representative Richardson added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), failed; Division of the House: yeas 33, nays 64 |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendment 1 (Pryor), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2013-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Baird |
2013-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Mayfield |