IN HB1309 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of environmental management. Revises references to federal regulations relating to variances from water quality standards. Provides that a variance from a water quality standard issued for a period of more than five years must be reevaluated in accordance with the requirements of the federal rule on variances from water quality standards. Provides that a variance relating to an NPDES permit may be submitted at any time before or after the issuance, renewal, or modification of the NPDES permit. Eliminates the requirement that the department itself, at least once per year, administer a certification examination for operators of water treatment plants, water distribution systems, and wastewater treatment plants. Requires instead the department to ensure that the examination is administered at least once per year, and allows the examination to be administered by independent third parties authorized by the commissioner of the department.
Title
Department of environmental management.
Sponsors
Rep. David Wolkins [R] | Rep. Beau Baird [R] | Rep. Sue Errington [D] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 126 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 90, nays 1 |
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 310: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as second sponsor |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-23 | House | Representatives Baird, Errington, Hamilton added as coauthors |
2020-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2020-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Wolkins |