IN HB1307 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lake County city and town court jurisdiction. Increases the maximum civil jurisdiction from an amount in controversy of $3,000 to an amount in controversy of $6,000 for the: (1) East Chicago, Gary, Hammond, Hobart, and Crown Point city courts; and (2) Merrillville town court. Specifies that a "clerk serving the county" includes the clerk of a city or town court for purposes of supplementing jury fees from the local jury pay fund.
Title
Lake County city and town court jurisdiction. Increases the maximum civil jurisdiction from an amount in controversy of $3,000 to an amount in controversy of $6,000 for the: (1) East Chicago, Gary, Hammond, Hobart, and Crown Point city courts; and (2) Merrillville town court. Specifies that a "clerk serving the county" includes the clerk of a city or town court for purposes of supplementing jury fees from the local jury pay fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 143 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 502: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Brown, C. added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Randolph added second sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Niemeyer added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Fine |