IN HB1304 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Representative Jackson added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Lake County magistrate. Allows the judge of the Lake superior court division No. 4 to appoint a magistrate to serve the Lake superior court division No. 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lake County magistrate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Jackson added as coauthor
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Olthoff and Aylesworth
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Slager

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback