IN HB1304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various criminal law matters. Requires the criminal justice institute to track the number of juveniles in adult court. Requires custodial interrogations of juveniles to be recorded. Raises the ages for waiver of jurisdiction of certain juveniles to adult court. Allows a person with an intellectual disability, developmental disability, or autism spectrum disorder to participate in a forensic diversion program. Authorizes a prosecuting attorney to require a person participating in a prosecutorial diversion program to receive mental health treatment to reduce recidivism, and allows diversion and deferral fees to be used to fund mental health treatment programs to reduce recidivism. Allows
Title
Various criminal law matters. Requires the criminal justice institute to track the number of juveniles in adult court. Requires custodial interrogations of juveniles to be recorded. Raises the ages for waiver of jurisdiction of certain juveniles to adult court. Allows a person with an intellectual disability, developmental disability, or autism spectrum disorder to participate in a forensic diversion program. Authorizes a prosecuting attorney to require a person participating in a prosecutorial diversion program to receive mental health treatment to reduce recidivism, and allows diversion and deferral fees to be used to fund mental health treatment programs to reduce recidivism. Allows
Sponsors
Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 187 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 589: yeas 75, nays 22 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senator Young R Michael removed as advisor |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senator Young R Michael added as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senator Taylor removed as conferee |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Pierce removed as conferee |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 563: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Young R Michael, Randolph and Houchin |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Steele and Taylor |
2015-04-21 | House | House Advisors appointed: Washburne, McNamara, Lawson L and GiaQuinta |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees appointed: McMillin and Pierce |
2015-04-21 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 456: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Stoops) failed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Broden) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Representatives Morrison, and Huston removed as coauthors |
2015-01-14 | House | Representatives Morrison, Huston, Steuerwald added as coauthors |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin |