IN HB1303 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 240
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State registration of privately certified individuals. Establishes a pilot project under which individuals who practice a certain occupation that is not a regulated profession under Indiana law can become "state registered" and be listed as practitioners of their occupation on the electronic registry of professions. However, provides that an individual may not be state registered in connection with any health care occupation or any occupation for which a person is licensed, certified, or registered by the Indiana plumbing commission. Provides that an individual, to become state registered, must hold a certification or credential from a supporting organization (a national organization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State registration of privately certified individuals. Establishes a pilot project under which individuals who practice a certain occupation that is not a regulated profession under Indiana law can become "state registered" and be listed as practitioners of their occupation on the electronic registry of professions. However, provides that an individual may not be state registered in connection with any health care occupation or any occupation for which a person is licensed, certified, or registered by the Indiana plumbing commission. Provides that an individual, to become state registered, must hold a certification or credential from a supporting organization (a national organization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Niezgodski) failed (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06HousePublic Law 240
2015-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateSenator Breaux removed as conferee
2015-04-29SenateSenator Miller Pete added as conferee
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 588: yeas 91, nays 6
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 557: yeas 29, nays 20
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Ford and Randolph
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Miller Patricia and Breaux
2015-04-20HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Torr, Mahan, Moseley and Bartlett
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees appointed: McMillin and Niezgodski
2015-04-16HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-16HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 463: yeas 45, nays 5
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #1 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-10SenateSenator Ford added as second sponsor
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Commerce & Technology
2015-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-17HouseSenator Miller, Pat added as sponsor
2015-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 66, nays 27
2015-02-16HouseAmendment #1 (Niezgodski) failed; Roll Call 145: yeas 27, nays 67
2015-02-16HouseAmendment #5 (Bartlett) ruled out of order
2015-02-16HouseAmendment #3 (McMillin) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-16HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-10HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-15HouseRepresentative Burton added as coauthor
2015-01-15HouseRepresentative Mahan added as coauthor
2015-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative McMillin
2015-01-13HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2015-01-13HouseRepresentative Torr added as coauthor

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1303/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/8/0/ff80d6cf/HB1303.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/c/5/f7c51935/HB1303.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/f/2/d4f2974c/HB1303.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/e/b/6deb1a2e/HB1303.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/b/8/beb84720/HB1303.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/c/b/d9cb9ce1/HB1303.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/5/3/df53defe/HB1303.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/9/5/5995a52a/HB1303.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/8/0/0580a0cb/HB1303.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/1/2/1d127954/HB1303.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/c/0/84c080f7/HB1303.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/d/7/5dd70858/HB1303.144.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/f/f/9cffde97/HB1303.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/3/2/09323163/HB1303.145.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/4/e/584eeaba/HB1303.165.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/f/3/68f3a357/HB1303.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/2/7/99275a48/HB1303.463.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/7/d/a47d6425/HB1303.557.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/1/f/151fc219/HB1303.588.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback