IN HB1303 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the driver of a special purpose bus or school bus (bus) at the time of the inspection shall be notified of an out-of-service order and a copy shall be made available on the Internet web site of the state police department. (Current law provides that a copy of the out-of-service order is to be forwarded to the governing body of the school corporation that controls the operation of the bus.) Requires the state school bus committee to adopt and enforce rules that require that each school bus placed into service for the first time bear in black letter on the back of the school bus: (1) an indication that the school bus is required to stop at all railroad crossings; and (2) the name of the school corporation. Provides that an individual who is or intends to become a school bus driver must obtain a physical examination certificate from an individual who is registered in the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration's National Registry of Certified Medical Examiners. Provides that a school corporation shall determine how a certified medical examiner who is to conduct the physical examination is chosen and who must pay for the physical examination.
Title
School bus safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] |
Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 130303 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 130301 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 130303 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 130301 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 42 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 422: yeas 86 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 326: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added second sponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-30 | House | Senator Yoder added as sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 154: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor. |
2014-01-29 | House | HB 1303 Amendment #1 (VanNatter), prevailed. |
2014-01-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-15 | House | Coauthored by: Representative Riecken |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative VanNatter. |