IN HB1297 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/17/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/17/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the law on swap agreements does not limit Ivy Tech Community College's general investment policies. Permits proceeds from a temporary borrowing to be used for building or facility construction costing more than $500,000 or for the purchase or lease-purchase of land, buildings, or facilities with a value of more than $250,000. Permits electronic transfers to be used for performance bonds. Specifies conditions for grant anticipation notes concerning acquisition and improvement of building facilities and equipment.
Title
Financing public university projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 79 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 278: Yeas 93, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-15 | Senator Errington added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Senator Broden | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Hershman, Simpson and Alting | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: Yeas 70, Nays 25 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 1 (Klinker), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-25 | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Representative Truitt removed as coauthor | |
2010-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-13 | Coauthored by Representatives Cherry, Pelath and Truitt | |
2010-01-13 | Authored by Representative Klinker |