IN HB1295 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Corrects references to the Indiana University school of public health (which was formerly a department of the university's medical school, but was designated as a separate school of the university in legislation enacted in 2007).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana University school of public health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 21
2013-04-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-03-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-03-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-19SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2013-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 48 and nays 0
2013-03-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-07SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2013-01-28HouseRepresentatives Harman and Koch added as coauthors
2013-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Bray and Stoops
2013-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 97, nays 0
2013-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-22HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Pierce
2013-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Mayfield

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback