IN HB1293 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Artisan distiller's permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Artisan distiller's permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 109
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 510: yeas 88, nays 4
2013-03-26SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2013-03-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 38 and nays 9
2013-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12SenateSenator Boots added as cosponsor
2013-03-12SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor
2013-03-04SenateSenator R. Young added as cosponsor
2013-02-26SenateSenator Grooms added as cosponsor
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2013-02-05HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Banks and Alting
2013-02-05HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 91, nays 8
2013-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2013-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Behning, Rhoads and DeLaney
2013-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback