IN HB1289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Senator Messmer removed as second sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Senator Messmer removed as second sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local regulation of natural resource development. Changes the definition of "urban area" for purposes of a land use statute in the area planning law to include any lands or lots used for residential purposes where there are at least 20 residences (instead of eight residences) within any quarter mile square area. Specifies that the statute does not authorize an ordinance or action of a plan commission or a board of zoning appeals prohibited by the remainder of the bill. Provides that the prohibition applies when exercising jurisdiction within the geographic area of a plan commission or board of zoning appeals,
Title
Local regulation of natural resource development. Changes the definition of "urban area" for purposes of a land use statute in the area planning law to include any lands or lots used for residential purposes where there are at least 20 residences (instead of eight residences) within any quarter mile square area. Specifies that the statute does not authorize an ordinance or action of a plan commission or a board of zoning appeals prohibited by the remainder of the bill. Provides that the prohibition applies when exercising jurisdiction within the geographic area of a plan commission or board of zoning appeals,
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senator Messmer removed as second sponsor |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Doriot and Messmer |
2018-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 63, nays 27 |
2018-02-01 | House | Representatives Bacon and Zent added as coauthors |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendment #1 (Ellington) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Ellington |