IN HB1289 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Hearing notices. Requires the county property tax assessment board of appeals to send notice of a scheduled hearing on a review of an assessment or deduction to a taxpayer's representative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hearing notices. Requires the county property tax assessment board of appeals to send notice of a scheduled hearing on a review of an assessment or deduction to a taxpayer's representative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-24HouseSenator Kenley added as sponsor
2015-02-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-02-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Smith M
2015-01-13HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback