IN HB1288 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTION 4 effective retroactive to 01/01/2008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTION 4 effective retroactive to 01/01/2008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a civil taxing unit's maximum permissible property tax levy may not be reduced if the unit does not use its entire maximum levy authority in the preceding year. Provides that a school corporation's maximum permissible transportation levy may not be reduced if the school corporation does not use its entire maximum levy authority in the preceding year. Permits Christamore House Inc. and any similarly situated nonprofit property owner to file a late property tax exemption application for a parcel of property that: (1) had a property tax exemption in 2006 and 2007 and has a property tax exemption in 2010 but did not have a property tax exemption in 2008 and 2009; and (2) is adjacent to a parcel of the owner's property that had a property tax exemption in 2008 and 2009. Permits a taxpayer having real property located in Decatur Township that failed to file a timely real property tax exemption for the 2008 and 2009 assessment dates to refile for the exemption and receive the exemption if the taxpayer had previously received an exemption and demonstrates that the real property otherwise qualified for the exemption.
Title
Property taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Cheatham [D] | Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] |
Rep. Vernon Smith [D] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | SECTION 4 effective retroactive to 01/01/2008 | |
2011-05-16 | SECTION 3 effective 05/09/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | SECTIONS 1 through 2 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 124 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 659: yeas 84, nays 0 | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 433: yeas 49 and nays 1 | |
2011-04-19 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-05 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-29 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2011-03-28 | Representatives Dermody and Moseley added as coauthors | |
2011-03-28 | House Rule 106.1 suspended | |
2011-03-28 | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Walker | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 98, nays 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-10 | Representatives Stemler, Karickhoff and Cheatham added as coauthors | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative M. Smith |