IN HB1287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial institutions and trade regulation. Makes various changes to the laws concerning: (1) first lien mortgage lenders; (2) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; (3) rental purchase agreements; (4) debt management companies; (5) financial institutions; (6) pawnbrokers; (7) money transmitters; and (8) check cashers. Repeals a provision providing an alternative regular reserve formula for certain credit unions. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Financial institutions and trade regulation. Makes various changes to the laws concerning: (1) first lien mortgage lenders; (2) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; (3) rental purchase agreements; (4) debt management companies; (5) financial institutions; (6) pawnbrokers; (7) money transmitters; and (8) check cashers. Repeals a provision providing an alternative regular reserve formula for certain credit unions. Makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 186 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 480: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 375: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; Roll Call 352: yeas 39, nays 7 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Senator Holdman added as sponsor |
2015-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment #1 (Riecken) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment #2 (Burton) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Moed and Riecken |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |