IN HB1284 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Public Law 107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Self-defense, defense of others, and firearms matters. Designates the following as voter registration offices: (1) Each office affiliated with the Indiana state police. (2) Each office affiliated with the sheriff of a county. (3) Each office affiliated with a municipal law enforcement agency. Provides immunity for a justified use of force in certain instances. Requires a court to award, in certain instances, reasonable attorney's fees and costs to a defendant when the justified use of force immunity is successfully raised. Permits a person who may legally possess a firearm to possess a firearm on school property if the person possesses the firearm: (1) as an employee or volunteer of a house of worship located on the school property; or (2) while attending a worship service or religious ceremony conducted at a house of worship. Increases the duration of a four year handgun license to five years. Provides that an individual may simultaneously hold both a five year license and a lifetime license. Requires a law enforcement officer to whom an application for a handgun license is made to consult available local, state, and federal criminal history data banks, including the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS), when determining whether possession of a firearm by an applicant would be a violation of state or federal law. Modifies the fees for five year licenses beginning July 1, 2020. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-defense, defense of others, and firearms matters. Designates the following as voter registration offices: (1) Each office affiliated with the Indiana state police. (2) Each office affiliated with the sheriff of a county. (3) Each office affiliated with a municipal law enforcement agency. Provides immunity for a justified use of force in certain instances. Requires a court to award, in certain instances, reasonable attorney's fees and costs to a defendant when the justified use of force immunity is successfully raised. Permits a person who may legally possess a firearm to possess a firearm on school property if the person possesses the firearm: (1) as an employee or volunteer of a house of worship located on the school property; or (2) while attending a worship service or religious ceremony conducted at a house of worship. Increases the duration of a four year handgun license to five years. Provides that an individual may simultaneously hold both a five year license and a lifetime license. Requires a law enforcement officer to whom an application for a handgun license is made to consult available local, state, and federal criminal history data banks, including the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS), when determining whether possession of a firearm by an applicant would be a violation of state or federal law. Modifies the fees for five year licenses beginning July 1, 2020. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Floor - (Y: 64 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HousePublic Law 107
2019-04-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-22SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 555: yeas 37, nays 7
2019-04-22HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 572: yeas 64, nays 17
2019-04-18SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-18HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-16SenateSenator Sandlin added as conferee
2019-04-16SenateSenator Lanane removed as conferee
2019-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Messmer, Taylor G and Garten
2019-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Tomes and Lanane
2019-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Smaltz, Torr, DeLaney and Pierce
2019-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lucas and Goodin
2019-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-08SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2019-04-08SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2019-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 404: yeas 42, nays 7
2019-04-04SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2019-04-02SenateAmendment #3 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-01SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2019-03-25SenateSenator Bohacek added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSenator Koch added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenators Houchin and Freeman added as cosponsors
2019-03-19SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateSenator Doriot added as cosponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Tomes, Messmer and Garten
2019-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 80, nays 13
2019-02-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Goodin added as coauthor
2019-01-15HouseRepresentatives Stutzman and Smaltz added as coauthors
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Lucas

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1284/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/c/c/3dcc0b44/HB1284.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/6/b/c06be3d4/HB1284.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/0/7/e2072b44/HB1284.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/2/0/8720f5c0/HB1284.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/8/c/d48c46af/HB1284.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/d/6/43d6eaed/HB1284.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/6/f/606f2640/HB1284.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/d/1/39d1699d/HB1284.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/e/0/4ee0f05d/HB1284.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/2/4/7d248833/HB1284.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/8/9/6b89a6f6/HB1284.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/3/7/b9373302/HB1284.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/f/2/1df233cd/HB1284.140.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/e/1/42e14764/HB1284.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/8/5/c3859366/HB1284.404.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/e/4/8ae4cf75/HB1284.572.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/3/7/2d373335/HB1284.555.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback