IN HB1283 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urban agricultural zones. Provides that a qualifying farmer may apply to a designating body to have an area designated as an urban agricultural zone. Provides that the term "urban agricultural zone" does not include rooftop gardening or farming practices that occur on the top of a building or residential home. Provides that a designating body, before designating an area as an urban agricultural zone, must hold a public hearing and allow for public comment. Provides that a designating body may exempt lands located partially or wholly within an urban agricultural zone from property taxation. Specifies that a designating body may not impose a special benefit tax for public services provided to an urban agricultural zone, unless the designating body imposed the special benefit tax before it designated the area as an urban agricultural zone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban agricultural zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 188
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 398: yeas 79, nays 0
2021-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-05SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2021-04-05SenateSenators Doriot, Breaux, Lanane, Tomes, Busch added as cosponsors
2021-04-05SenateSenator Buchanan added as third sponsor
2021-04-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 337: yeas 47, nays 1
2021-04-01SenateAmendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-30SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-03-11SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Taylor G
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 92, nays 0
2021-02-17HouseAmendment #1 (Harris) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-15HouseRepresentatives Bauer M, Lehe, Aylesworth added as coauthors
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Harris

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1283/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/8/e/cd8e355c/HB1283.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/c/e/e6ceec32/HB1283.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/d/2/52d244a4/HB1283.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/9/0/8e90b744/HB1283.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/4/9/74493402/HB1283.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/1/a/0d1a76fc/HB1283.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/2/5/fd25dcd1/HB1283.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/e/9/01e91ebc/HB1283.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/c/5/9bc5b12a/HB1283.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/e/4/b5e4b052/HB1283.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/b/b/10bb123e/HB1283.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/6/b/b26b10ec/HB1283.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/6/b/e96b2f53/HB1283.07.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/1/e/e41ee07c/HB1283.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/d/0/cbd0999d/HB1283.05.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/e/5/a1e5a7c7/HB1283.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/5/4/2554b75f/HB1283.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/7/7/7477a261/HB1283.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/6/e/d26e1137/HB1283.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/e/0/a5e08e4a/HB1283.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/a/f/0baf1fe4/HB1283.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/0/f/8b0f4f1b/HB1283.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/5/d/3e5da794/HB1283.05.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/d/d/c0ddadb0/HB1283.04.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/6/3/fd633070/HB1283.06.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/4/6/c6465bb7/HB1283.06.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/f/9/e4f937d0/HB1283.06.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/9/4/4094afc7/HB1283.07.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/6/b/506b3fbe/HB1283.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/9/6/0c9624d8/HB1283.221_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/3/3/40336ebb/HB1283.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/d/e/50de559a/HB1283.04.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/d/8/63d877e6/HB1283.337_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/d/8/45d8fe2f/HB1283.398_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback