IN HB1283 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Representatives Thompson and Pfaff added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Trauma response instruction for teachers. Provides that a teacher preparation program should consider using certain curricula pertaining to student trauma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trauma response instruction for teachers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23HouseRepresentatives Thompson and Pfaff added as coauthors
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-21HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative DeVon

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback