IN HB1281 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Financial literacy. Provides that, beginning with the cohort of students who are expected to graduate from a public school or a charter school in 2027, an individual must successfully complete a personal financial responsibility course (course) before the individual may graduate. Creates requirements for content that must be covered in a course. Provides that a public school or charter school may offer instruction on a course as a separate subject or as units incorporated into appropriate subjects. Provides that a course may qualify as a mathematics credit for an alternative diploma under if offered as a separate subject.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial literacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2023-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2023-02-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Koch
2023-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 177: yeas 94, nays 0
2023-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-02-07HouseRepresentative Miller K added as coauthor
2023-02-07HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2023-01-19HouseRepresentative Criswell C added as coauthor
2023-01-12HouseRepresentative Pierce K added as coauthor
2023-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2023-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Hall
2023-01-11HouseCoauthored by Representative O'Brien

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback