IN HB1281 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local government investments. Provides that a political subdivision (other than a township) is not required to deposit funds on the next business day following receipt of the funds if the funds on hand do not exceed $500. (Under current law, a political subdivision (other than a township) must deposit funds not later than the next business day following the receipt of the funds regardless of the amount.) Increases the current threshold amount for the legislative branch to be required to deposit funds on the next business day from $100 to $500. Provides that if the proceeds from the sale of
Title
Local government investments. Provides that a political subdivision (other than a township) is not required to deposit funds on the next business day following receipt of the funds if the funds on hand do not exceed $500. (Under current law, a political subdivision (other than a township) must deposit funds not later than the next business day following the receipt of the funds regardless of the amount.) Increases the current threshold amount for the legislative branch to be required to deposit funds on the next business day from $100 to $500. Provides that if the proceeds from the sale of
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 139 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 477: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 355: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Charbonneau added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendment #1 (Ober) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Representatives Aylesworth, Olthoff, DeLaney added as coauthors |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |