IN HB1279 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 400: yeas 46, nays 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Local transportation projects. Provides that the board of the northwest Indiana regional development authority (NWIRDA) may establish any nonprofit entity to carry out and further the purposes, plans, and goals of the NWIRDA with regard to projects located within a transit development district. Authorizes the nonprofit entity to use money it receives only for projects that are located within a transit development district and to further any part of the comprehensive strategic plan of the development authority that relates to transit development districts. Specifies that the nonprofit entity is a governmental body required to provide its current audited financial statements to the development authority. Adds similar provisions to allow the north central Indiana regional development authority to establish a nonprofit entity to carry out and further the purposes, plans, and goals of that development authority with regard to projects located within a transit development district established by the NWIRDA. Requires the redevelopment commission for each county that is a member of the north central Indiana regional development authority to collaborate with the development authority for the purposes of the nonprofit entity. Provides that certain provisions related to electronic communications, executive sessions, and public records apply to a nonprofit entity created by the NWIRDA or a nonprofit entity established by the north central Indiana regional development authority. Provides that the NWIRDA may expend money related to transit development districts or any nonprofit entity created by the NWIRDA to carry out and further the purposes of the NWIRDA with regard to projects located within a transit development district. Provides that the Indiana finance authority (IFA), the NWIRDA, or the northern Indiana commuter transportation district (NICTD) may enter upon land to conduct a survey or investigation for the construction of the following rail projects: (1) The mainline double tracking project. (2) The West Lake corridor project. Provides that the IFA, the NWIRDA, or the NICTD has the same powers and duties as the Indiana department of transportation with regard to the work, including the means of conducting the survey or investigation, provision of notice to occupants of the land, and compensation for damages to land or water incurred in conducting the work. Requires the state budget committee to annually review the amount raised from sources other than taxes and fares for public transportation projects established in certain central Indiana counties. Provides that, in the case of Marion County, if the fiscal body of Marion County does not pay at least 10% of the annual operating expenses of the public transportation project from sources other than taxes and fares, then after December 31 of that year the following apply until the fiscal body of Marion County pays the amount, as determined following the annual state budget committee for review: (1) Beginning after June 30, 2020, the treasurer of state shall withhold 10% from the amount of the certified distribution attributable to the additional tax local income tax rate imposed in Marion County for the public transportation project. (2) Money in Marion County's public transportation project fund may be used only for certain purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local transportation projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Freeman) prevailed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 400: yeas 46, nays 3
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Ruckelshaus, Melton, Freeman and Taylor G
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Mishler and Tallian
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Sherman, Sullivan, Behning, Steuerwald, Harris, Porter, Shackleford, DeLaney, Pryor, Hamilton and Summers
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Soliday and Macer
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 43, nays 7
2020-03-02SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #6 (Freeman) prevailed; Roll Call 251: yeas 35, nays 12
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #5 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Pressel and Harris added as coauthors
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Mishler and Charbonneau
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1279/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/7/6/287642c7/HB1279.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/e/d/70ed06fb/HB1279.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/5/c/f25ca031/HB1279.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/9/5/f495195e/HB1279.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/2/7/5b272e9f/HB1279.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/5/0/2a50216f/HB1279.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/1/9/e0195a24/HB1279.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/2/1/80211065/HB1279.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/7/9/f07966a9/HB1279.100_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/3/b/8f3b0c5c/HB1279.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/4/5/5345904f/HB1279.251_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/f/c/03fc3d1a/HB1279.307_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/1/f/9c1fda74/HB1279.400_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback