IN HB1279 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 251
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Natural resources matters. Provides that a person may reconstruct an earthen berm or levee located in a floodway: (1) if the person obtains a permit from the department of natural resources (DNR); or (2) if the earthen berm or levee is located in a rural area, if it was constructed before January 1, 1973, or after December 31, 1972, pursuant to a construction permit issued by the DNR, and if the plans and specifications for the reconstruction demonstrate to the satisfaction of the DNR that the reconstruction will meet certain requirements. Makes the violation of certain prohibitions or requirements concerning the reconstruction of an earthen berm or levee a Class B infraction. Establishes new requirements concerning freeholders' signatures on a petition to establish a conservancy district, providing: (1) that for a proposed district of not more than 5,000 freeholds, 30% of the freeholders must sign the petition; that for a proposed district of more than 5,000 but not more than 25,000 freeholds, 15%, but not less than 1,000, of the freeholders must sign the petition; and that for a proposed district of more than 25,000 freeholds, 10%, but not less than 3,000, of the freeholders must sign the petition; and (2) that the freeholders signing a petition to establish a conservancy district must own at least 51% of the assessed valuation of the real property located within the boundaries of the proposed conservancy district. Provides that these new requirements do not apply to the establishment of a conservancy district pursuant to a petition filed with a clerk of the circuit court before January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources matters. Provides that a person may reconstruct an earthen berm or levee located in a floodway: (1) if the person obtains a permit from the department of natural resources (DNR); or (2) if the earthen berm or levee is located in a rural area, if it was constructed before January 1, 1973, or after December 31, 1972, pursuant to a construction permit issued by the DNR, and if the plans and specifications for the reconstruction demonstrate to the satisfaction of the DNR that the reconstruction will meet certain requirements. Makes the violation of certain prohibitions or requirements concerning the reconstruction of an earthen berm or levee a Class B infraction. Establishes new requirements concerning freeholders' signatures on a petition to establish a conservancy district, providing: (1) that for a proposed district of not more than 5,000 freeholds, 30% of the freeholders must sign the petition; that for a proposed district of more than 5,000 but not more than 25,000 freeholds, 15%, but not less than 1,000, of the freeholders must sign the petition; and that for a proposed district of more than 25,000 freeholds, 10%, but not less than 3,000, of the freeholders must sign the petition; and (2) that the freeholders signing a petition to establish a conservancy district must own at least 51% of the assessed valuation of the real property located within the boundaries of the proposed conservancy district. Provides that these new requirements do not apply to the establishment of a conservancy district pursuant to a petition filed with a clerk of the circuit court before January 1, 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 251
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 651: yeas 91, nays 6
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 611: yeas 43, nays 6
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Messmer, Niezgodski, Merritt and Spartz
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Zay and Stoops
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Miller D, Aylesworth, Boy, Errington and Jackson
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wolkins and Klinker
2019-04-15HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-15HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-12SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 442: yeas 44, nays 4
2019-04-09SenateAmendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-09SenateAmendment #1 (Spartz) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-08SenateSenator Messmer added as second sponsor
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Zay
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 93, nays 1
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Miller added as coauthor
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Wolkins

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1279/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/9/f/c39f0eef/HB1279.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/2/d/362d9f14/HB1279.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/8/2/d88208fa/HB1279.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/0/5/ae059437/HB1279.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/a/3/eea3e529/HB1279.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/2/2/172214b9/HB1279.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/b/0/dbb0842f/HB1279.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/4/3/20438798/HB1279.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/7/8/7978549d/HB1279.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/2/e/d82e8824/HB1279.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/5/4/aa544851/HB1279.108.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/a/a/3daae4c3/HB1279.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/b/c/f4bc7265/HB1279.442.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/c/6/70c6bed2/HB1279.651.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/0/2/a9021fff/HB1279.611.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback