IN HB1279 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senator Zakas added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senator Zakas added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that it is a Class C infraction if a person uses a telecommunications device to transmit a text message or electronic mail message while operating a moving motor vehicle. Provides, for purposes of the prohibition against using a telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle, that "telecommunications device" does not include amateur radio equipment operated by a person licensed by the FCC as an amateur radio operator. Allows a person to use hands-free or voice-operated technology to transmit a text message or electronic mail message while operating a moving motor vehicle. Repeals the current definition of "telecommunications device".
Title
Texting while driving.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Senators Lanane, Errington and Randolph added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-11 | Senators Wyss and Landske added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Tallian | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: Yeas 95, Nays 3 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Representative Koch added as coauthor | |
2010-01-20 | Representatives Summers and Michael added as coauthors | |
2010-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2010-01-12 | Authored by Representative Pearson |