IN HB1278 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - Representatives Thompson and Duncan added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes a direct broadcast satellite service fee on direct broadcast satellite service providers at the same percentage rate of gross revenue as the cable service franchise fee rate in effect in a local government unit on December 31, 2009. Permits the fee to be passed through to customers of the provider. Requires a provider to remit the fees quarterly to the department of state revenue. Requires a provider to submit a quarterly report to the department indicating a provider's gross revenue and the amount of fees paid with respect to each unit. Requires the department to publish the direct broadcast satellite service fee rates before August 1, 2010. Requires the department to distribute the fees quarterly to each unit. Permits the wireless enhanced 911 advisory board to set the wireless emergency enhanced 911 fee at a rate not less $2 beginning July 1, 2010, on each commercial mobile radio service subscriber that is a customer having a place of primary use in Indiana. Provides for a distribution of 25% of a part of the 911 fees to counties that have more than two public safety answering points (PSAPs) and 75% to counties that have reduced the number of PSAPs to no more than two.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadcast satellite service fee and 911 fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-25 Representatives Thompson and Duncan added as coauthors
2010-01-19 Reassigned to the Committee on Ways and Means
2010-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities
2010-01-12 Authored by Representative Crawford

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback