IN HB1276 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a township board to meet in February (instead of January) to approve the annual report of the township trustee. Allows a township board to reduce the salaries of the township board members by a vote of a majority of the members (instead of by a unanimous vote of the members).
Title
Township board meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 6 |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-11 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Landske and Taylor |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Amendment 1 (Thompson), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-07 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-04 | House | Representative Pryor added as coauthor |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Niemeyer |