IN HB1270 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 282
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Kankakee River basin and Yellow River basin development. Abolishes the Kankakee River basin commission and repeals its statute. Establishes the Kankakee River basin and Yellow River basin development commission (commission) as a public body corporate and politic. Authorizes the commission to participate in the flood control program operated by the Indiana finance authority. Requires certain state agencies to assist each other in simplifying the permitting process with respect to the flood control activities of the commission. Provides that there is imposed in each calendar year beginning after December 31, 2020, an annual special assessment against each taxable parcel of real property that is located within any part of the basin within an Indiana county. Requires the default special assessments to be paid to be paid to the commission. Specifies the amount of the default special assessment by parcel category and the commission's permissible uses of the special assessments. Provides that a county fiscal body may adopt a resolution opting to implement one of the following methods of supporting the commission instead of collecting the default special assessments: (1) Paying direct support to the commission in lieu of the default special assessments. (2) Supplementing reduced special assessments with direct support payments. (3) Imposing special assessments that exceed the amount that could be raised through the default special assessments. Provides that direct support must equal at least 90% of the amount that could be raised through the default special assessments. Specifies the amounts that a county may retain in calendar years beginning after December 31, 2022, from special assessments imposed instead of the default special assessments. Establishes an advisory committee to the commission. Requires the commission to coordinate its flood control activities with other public agencies to ensure that undeveloped public land is used for providing flood storage to the greatest extent feasible before other lands are used. Authorizes an Indiana business preference if certain conditions are met. Establishes an Indiana employment goal with respect to contracts for public works awarded by the commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kankakee River basin and Yellow River basin development. Abolishes the Kankakee River basin commission and repeals its statute. Establishes the Kankakee River basin and Yellow River basin development commission (commission) as a public body corporate and politic. Authorizes the commission to participate in the flood control program operated by the Indiana finance authority. Requires certain state agencies to assist each other in simplifying the permitting process with respect to the flood control activities of the commission. Provides that there is imposed in each calendar year beginning after December 31, 2020, an annual special assessment against each taxable parcel of real property that is located within any part of the basin within an Indiana county. Requires the default special assessments to be paid to be paid to the commission. Specifies the amount of the default special assessment by parcel category and the commission's permissible uses of the special assessments. Provides that a county fiscal body may adopt a resolution opting to implement one of the following methods of supporting the commission instead of collecting the default special assessments: (1) Paying direct support to the commission in lieu of the default special assessments. (2) Supplementing reduced special assessments with direct support payments. (3) Imposing special assessments that exceed the amount that could be raised through the default special assessments. Provides that direct support must equal at least 90% of the amount that could be raised through the default special assessments. Specifies the amounts that a county may retain in calendar years beginning after December 31, 2022, from special assessments imposed instead of the default special assessments. Establishes an advisory committee to the commission. Requires the commission to coordinate its flood control activities with other public agencies to ensure that undeveloped public land is used for providing flood storage to the greatest extent feasible before other lands are used. Authorizes an Indiana business preference if certain conditions are met. Establishes an Indiana employment goal with respect to contracts for public works awarded by the commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HousePublic Law 282
2019-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 563: yeas 84, nays 2
2019-04-18HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 484: yeas 40, nays 5
2019-04-15SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-03-19SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-24HouseRepresentatives Pressel, Aylesworth, Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors
2019-01-24HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
2019-01-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-01-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Gutwein

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1270/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/1/9/821995d7/HB1270.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/c/d/b8cd92a6/HB1270.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/6/a/306a026a/HB1270.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/3/4/f6341c37/HB1270.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/9/5/6295d221/HB1270.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/9/1/18917e0c/HB1270.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/3/e/8e3e679c/HB1270.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/5/8/23584adf/HB1270.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/1/8/5618ee11/HB1270.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/7/d/5f7d2abc/HB1270.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/b/6/6ab60640/HB1270.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/b/1/a3b1ed7e/HB1270.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/d/4/59d4e871/HB1270.37.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/7/4/3b7422cf/HB1270.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/8/3/1c83d5a6/HB1270.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/9/c/fe9c06a7/HB1270.484.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/c/d/d9cdf43a/HB1270.563.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback