IN HB1268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran status information data base. Requires the following questions to be included on applications for a driver's license or permit and for a state identification card: (1) "Have you served in the armed forces of the United States?". (2) "Are you the surviving spouse of someone who served in the armed forces of the United States or their reserves, in the National Guard, or in the Indiana National Guard?". Makes it optional for an applicant for a driver's license or permit and an applicant for a state identification card to answer the following questions set forth on applications for a driver's license or permit and for a state identification card: (1) "Have you served in the armed forces of the United States?". (2) "Are you the surviving spouse of someone who served in the armed forces of the United States or their reserves, in the National Guard, or in the Indiana National Guard?". Allows for the Indiana department of veterans' affairs to develop outreach programs for veterans and their families using information received from driver's license and permit applications and state identification card applications.
Title
Veteran status information data base. Requires the following questions to be included on applications for a driver's license or permit and for a state identification card: (1) "Have you served in the armed forces of the United States?". (2) "Are you the surviving spouse of someone who served in the armed forces of the United States or their reserves, in the National Guard, or in the Indiana National Guard?". Makes it optional for an applicant for a driver's license or permit and an applicant for a state identification card to answer the following questions set forth on applications for a driver's license or permit and for a state identification card: (1) "Have you served in the armed forces of the United States?". (2) "Are you the surviving spouse of someone who served in the armed forces of the United States or their reserves, in the National Guard, or in the Indiana National Guard?". Allows for the Indiana department of veterans' affairs to develop outreach programs for veterans and their families using information received from driver's license and permit applications and state identification card applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Public Law 82 |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 413: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second sponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 272: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Tomes |
2019-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Representatives Sullivan, Judy, Moseley added as coauthors |
2019-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Gutwein |