IN HB1264 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child care background checks. Requires employees and volunteers of a child care facility who may be present on the premises of the child care facility during operating hours to submit to a national criminal history background check. (Under current law, employees and volunteers who have direct contact with children must submit to a national criminal history background check.) Specifies that results of the background check may be used as grounds for denial or revocation of a child care license or registration or eligibility for a child care and development fund voucher payment. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care background checks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 121
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 331: yeas 75, nays 0
2020-03-05HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-02-27SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-25SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateSenator Mrvan added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2020-02-03HouseRepresentative Wright added as coauthor
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Houchin
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 93, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative May

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1264/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/5/a/315a6954/HB1264.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/1/e/9a1eb890/HB1264.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/b/5/f0b56d12/HB1264.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/1/0/bb10c66f/HB1264.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/2/3/55238fde/HB1264.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/c/a/05ca011a/HB1264.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/d/3/71d3e748/HB1264.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/6/6/3f6663ad/HB1264.160_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/0/a/f40a0c7f/HB1264.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/b/8/04b88c1f/HB1264.305_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/0/0/dd001357/HB1264.331_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback