IN HB1264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Representative Clere added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Representative Clere added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Competency based high school education. Establishes the competency based high school education pilot program (pilot program) to provide grants to school corporations for the design and implementation of competency based education programs in high schools. Provides that the department of education (department) administers the pilot program. Requires a school corporation to apply and provide certain information to the department to participate in the pilot program. Requires the Indiana state board of education to establish requirements and standards concerning the competency based education programs. Provides that, after June 30, 2019, a school corporation is eligible to receive a grant for participation
Title
Competency based high school education. Establishes the competency based high school education pilot program (pilot program) to provide grants to school corporations for the design and implementation of competency based education programs in high schools. Provides that the department of education (department) administers the pilot program. Requires a school corporation to apply and provide certain information to the department to participate in the pilot program. Requires the Indiana state board of education to establish requirements and standards concerning the competency based education programs. Provides that, after June 30, 2019, a school corporation is eligible to receive a grant for participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Brown T |