IN HB1260 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Gift certificates and store gift cards. Provides that a person shall not sell or issue to an Indiana consumer any gift certificate or store gift card with an expiration date unless certain conditions are met. Provides that, with respect to a gift certificate or store gift card that is sold or issued to an Indiana consumer after December 31, 2022, if at any time after the gift certificate or store gift card is issued or sold: (1) the merchant for which the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued: (A) for any reason ceases to do business in Indiana; or (B) for any reason: (i) substantially changes; or (ii) ceases to offer; the types of goods or services that were offered to consumers at the time the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued; and (2) any expiration date: (A) authorized under the bill's provisions; and (B) applicable to the gift certificate or store gift card (or to the underlying funds associated with either) has not elapsed; the merchant for which the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued shall, upon the request of an Indiana consumer who is the rightful holder of the gift certificate or store gift card, promptly refund to the holder the balance of the underlying funds or provide the holder with the remaining balance in some other manner. Provides that a person that violates the bill's provisions: (1) commits a deceptive act that is actionable by an aggrieved consumer and the attorney general under the deceptive consumer sales act; and (2) is subject to the penalties and remedies set forth in the deceptive consumer sales act. Authorizes the attorney general to adopt rules to implement these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gift certificates and store gift cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Young M
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 96, nays 0
2021-02-16HouseAmendment #1 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-15HouseRepresentative Morris added as coauthor
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Miller D and McNamara
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1260/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/a/0/01a0b768/HB1260.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/5/4/3b548768/HB1260.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/5/b/655b6dbb/HB1260.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/d/5/1fd59428/HB1260.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/b/6/02b6b636/HB1260.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/f/8/17f878a8/HB1260.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/c/4/bec48d77/HB1260.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/3/7/28372044/HB1260.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/f/c/effce743/HB1260.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/3/6/89364065/HB1260.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/2/e/df2ebe33/HB1260.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/7/0/9b7090ff/HB1260.01.INTR.05.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/4/8/37485756/HB1260.181_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback