IN HB1258 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of homeland security. Provides that the fire prevention and building safety commission will adopt rules for regulated boiler and pressure vessels. (Current law provides that the boiler and pressure vessel rules board adopts rules for regulated boiler and pressure vessels.) Provides that the division may conduct a program of inspections of regulated boilers and pressure vessels. (Current law provides that the division shall conduct a program of periodic inspections of regulated boiler and pressure vessels.) Provides that the division shall: (1) issue a regulated boiler and pressure vessel operating permit to certain applicants; (2) perform operating permit inspections of a boiler or pressure vessel owned by the state; (3) conduct a program to audit boiler and pressure vessel inspectors; and (4) conduct a program to audit inspections completed by a boiler and pressure vessel inspector. Provides requirements for qualifying or renewing an operating permit. Removes requirements for inspections. Provides the fire prevention and building safety commission (commission) with emergency rulemaking authority to adopt rules concerning the division's inspection program. Removes provisions in the Indiana Code concerning inspection agencies. Provides that the commission may sanction a boiler and pressure vessel inspector in certain instances. Removes provisions in the Indiana Code concerning owner or user inspection agencies. Allows members of police and fire departments to reside within a county that is noncontiguous to the county where the police or fire department is located but is not more than 50 miles from the closest boundary of the city, town, or township where the police or fire department is located. Includes an emergency management worker and a division fire investigator in the definition of "public safety officer" to qualify the person for the special death benefit for a public safety officer who dies in the line of duty.
Title
Department of homeland security. Provides that the fire prevention and building safety commission will adopt rules for regulated boiler and pressure vessels. (Current law provides that the boiler and pressure vessel rules board adopts rules for regulated boiler and pressure vessels.) Provides that the division may conduct a program of inspections of regulated boilers and pressure vessels. (Current law provides that the division shall conduct a program of periodic inspections of regulated boiler and pressure vessels.) Provides that the division shall: (1) issue a regulated boiler and pressure vessel operating permit to certain applicants; (2) perform operating permit inspections of a boiler or pressure vessel owned by the state; (3) conduct a program to audit boiler and pressure vessel inspectors; and (4) conduct a program to audit inspections completed by a boiler and pressure vessel inspector. Provides requirements for qualifying or renewing an operating permit. Removes requirements for inspections. Provides the fire prevention and building safety commission (commission) with emergency rulemaking authority to adopt rules concerning the division's inspection program. Removes provisions in the Indiana Code concerning inspection agencies. Provides that the commission may sanction a boiler and pressure vessel inspector in certain instances. Removes provisions in the Indiana Code concerning owner or user inspection agencies. Allows members of police and fire departments to reside within a county that is noncontiguous to the county where the police or fire department is located but is not more than 50 miles from the closest boundary of the city, town, or township where the police or fire department is located. Includes an emergency management worker and a division fire investigator in the definition of "public safety officer" to qualify the person for the special death benefit for a public safety officer who dies in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Public Law 171 |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 594: yeas 80, nays 5 |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Gaskill and Randolph Lonnie M |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Melton |
2019-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: Miller D, Leonard, Chyung and Moseley |
2019-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Frye R and Macer |
2019-04-15 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 441: yeas 40, nays 8 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Representatives Leonard, Zent, Macer added as coauthors |
2019-02-04 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2019-02-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 89: yeas 72, nays 18 |
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Frye R |