IN HB1258 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the medical licensing board to: (1) before August 1, 2014, establish a pilot program to provide telehealth services to patients in Indiana; and (2) report to the general assembly concerning the outcomes of the pilot program. Sets forth requirements of the pilot program. Establishes time frames for the expiration of the pilot program, the latest of which is July 1, 2016.
Title
Telehealth pilot program.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 125802 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 125801 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 125802 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 125801 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 74 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 428: yeas 46 and nays 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 478: yeas 98 and nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Becker added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Harris added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Stemler added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Morris added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Cox added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Shackleford added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Clere added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 320: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-29 | House | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 94: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Breaux added as third sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Becker added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Pat Miller added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Stemler added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Davisson, Clere |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Shackleford. |