IN HB1256 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Archives and record administration. Amends related definitions. Allows the attorney general to retain and publish records and opinions in electronic format. Amends various duties for the Indiana archives and records administration (administration). Removes the requirement that the administration follow procedures and forms prescribed by the federal government in implementing a forms management program. Requires the administration to establish standards for the design, redesign, numbering, standardization, consolidation, or elimination of forms used by state government. Provides that the administration must apply the definition of "record" to certain governmental materials. Requires a state agency to do the following: (1) Submit recommended retention schedules to the administration. (2) Follow the standards developed by the administration when creating and revising state forms. (3) Designate an agency forms coordinator to manage the creation and revision of state forms belonging to the agency and serve as a liaison between the agency and the administration. (4) Designate an agency records coordinator to coordinate the creation and revision of agency records retention schedules, educate agency staff on records management processes, and serve as a liaison between the agency and the administration. Removes certain duties of the oversight committee on public records. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Archives and record administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Andrea Hunley [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 222 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 496: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 507: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ford J.D. and Buck |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Alting and Pol |
2023-04-06 | House | House advisors appointed: Clere, Abbott and Miller K |
2023-04-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehman and Pierce M |
2023-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Alting and Hunley |
2023-02-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-31 | House | Representative Miller D added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-30 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2023-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2023-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Pierce M |
2023-01-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative Lehman |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATION, STATE DEPARTMENT OF
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, Work Training
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
OPEN DOOR LAW
PUBLIC RECORDS
STATE AGENCIES
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, Work Training
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
OPEN DOOR LAW
PUBLIC RECORDS
STATE AGENCIES