IN HB1256 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various local government matters. Provides that a county that sells a county hospital before January 1, 2017, may establish a charitable nonprofit foundation (foundation) to hold some or all of the proceeds of the sale of the county hospital in trust for the benefit of the county, by the council and the county executive adopting substantially similar ordinances to establish the foundation after June 30, 2018. Provides that the ordinances do not supersede or replace any previously adopted ordinance or agreement effectuating: (1) monetary disbursements; and (2) distributions from the previously executed asset purchase agreement to an Indiana nonprofit corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various local government matters. Provides that a county that sells a county hospital before January 1, 2017, may establish a charitable nonprofit foundation (foundation) to hold some or all of the proceeds of the sale of the county hospital in trust for the benefit of the county, by the council and the county executive adopting substantially similar ordinances to establish the foundation after June 30, 2018. Provides that the ordinances do not supersede or replace any previously adopted ordinance or agreement effectuating: (1) monetary disbursements; and (2) distributions from the previously executed asset purchase agreement to an Indiana nonprofit corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HousePublic Law 183
2018-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-14SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 413: yeas 47, nays 0
2018-03-14HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 393: yeas 97, nays 0
2018-03-14SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2018-03-14HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2018-03-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Grooms, Niezgodski and Buck
2018-03-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Perfect and Breaux
2018-03-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Clere, Mahan, Saunders and Pryor
2018-03-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lyness and Moed
2018-03-08HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2018-03-08HouseMotion to dissent filed
2018-03-08HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2018-03-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2018-03-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 321: yeas 49, nays 0
2018-03-05SenateSenator Breaux added as cosponsor
2018-03-05SenateAmendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote
2018-03-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-03-01SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2018-03-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2018-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Perfect
2018-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 93, nays 0
2018-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-31HouseRepresentative Moed added as coauthor
2018-01-30HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2018-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Lyness

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/house/1256/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/6/0/a7608b10/HB1256.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/e/8/e1e86aa4/HB1256.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/c/9/e5c92d9e/HB1256.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/8/5/238544fc/HB1256.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/0/4/c3047781/HB1256.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/e/e/b4eea2fe/HB1256.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/5/4/3354b42f/HB1256.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/d/b/b1db3898/HB1256.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/d/1/49d1febe/HB1256.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/7/d/b47d05b5/HB1256.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/6/5/d565dee0/HB1256.166.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/d/6/e0d6bda7/HB1256.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/8/a/468a71ce/HB1256.321.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/2/a/d42ac52e/HB1256.393.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/e/f/b6ef5707/HB1256.413.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback