IN HB1256 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a court to impose a fine of at least $500 but not more than $5,000 on a person who is: (1) an employee of the department of correction or a penal facility; and (2) convicted of committing trafficking with an inmate as a Class A misdemeanor; if the article involved was a cigarette or tobacco product. Requires a court to impose a fine of at least $500 but not more than $10,000 on a person who is convicted of committing trafficking with an inmate involving a cellular telephone or other wireless or cellular communications device as a Class C felony. Makes it a Class D felony for a person who is not: (1) an inmate of a penal facility; or (2) a child of a juvenile facility; to knowingly or intentionally possess in, or carry or cause to be brought into, the penal facility or juvenile facility a deadly weapon without the prior authorization of the person in charge of the penal facility or juvenile facility. Makes it a Class A misdemeanor for a person to knowingly or intentionally possess a cellular telephone or other wireless or cellular communications device while incarcerated in any penal facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful possession of items in penal facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 5
2013-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-03-19SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-14SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2013-03-14SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-03-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-07SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-03-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2013-02-05HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Steele and Arnold
2013-02-05HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 99, nays 0
2013-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-31HouseRepresentative Lawson added as coauthor
2013-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2013-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Dermody

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback