IN HB1256 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile court jurisdiction. Provides that a child who: (1) commits indecent display by a youth; or (2) commits dangerous possession of a firearm or provides a firearm to another child in certain circumstances; has committed a delinquent act subject to the jurisdiction of a juvenile court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile court jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HousePublic Law 84
2021-04-19HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-24SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-23SenateSenator Sandlin added as second sponsor
2021-03-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 36, nays 12
2021-03-22SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 240: yeas 17, nays 31
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-11HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Young M
2021-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 92, nays 1
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Steuerwald
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1256/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/e/8/7ae85145/HB1256.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/e/7/99e7a6ef/HB1256.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/f/0/e5f03bee/HB1256.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/1/d/ee1d92b2/HB1256.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/f/9/ccf95d09/HB1256.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/0/2/6102d44f/HB1256.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/4/d/fb4daab2/HB1256.04.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/1/2/8112ec59/HB1256.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/5/0/a55058ed/HB1256.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/6/3/6263d9ad/HB1256.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/9/6/2d9689f6/HB1256.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/9/6/b59669e8/HB1256.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/a/0/28a03c6f/HB1256.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/e/1/b1e1a62e/HB1256.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/d/d/8eddd405/HB1256.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/3/3/42338f75/HB1256.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/c/c/f0cce60d/HB1256.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/2/7/6827b9ae/HB1256.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/b/2/6eb2b3c0/HB1256.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/a/e/0faea9f4/HB1256.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/8/d/8f8da6e8/HB1256.109_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/4/e/f44efa11/HB1256.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/9/f/819fb6d3/HB1256.240_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/5/0/41500b11/HB1256.262_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback