IN HB1252 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Perry County council to impose an additional county economic development income tax (EDIT) rate of up to 0.5% of a county taxpayer's adjusted gross income to construct or improve the county jail. Provides that the Perry County CEDIT tax rate plus the county option income tax (COIT) rate may not exceed 1.75% of a county taxpayer's adjusted gross income.
Title
CEDIT for Perry County jail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 199 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House | |
2011-04-21 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 404: yeas 37 and nays 12 | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Lawson and R. Young | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 375: yeas 65, nays 30 | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | Coauthored by Representative Davisson | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Ellspermann |