IN HB1250 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Battery offenses. Adds the following offenses to the statutory definition of "crime of violence": (1) Battery as a Level 2 felony. (2) Battery as a Level 3 felony. (3) Battery as a Level 4 felony. (4) Battery as a Level 5 felony. Adds a bailiff of any court and a special deputy to the definition of "public safety official" for purposes of the battery statute. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Battery offenses. Adds the following offenses to the statutory definition of "crime of violence": (1) Battery as a Level 2 felony. (2) Battery as a Level 3 felony. (3) Battery as a Level 4 felony. (4) Battery as a Level 5 felony. Adds a bailiff of any court and a special deputy to the definition of "public safety official" for purposes of the battery statute. Makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Public Law 80 |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 333: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 42, nays 8 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second sponsor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Jordan added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2018-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 82, nays 8 |
2018-01-29 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Negele |