IN HB1248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 247
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 247
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacists; physician assistants. Sets out the conditions for emergency pharmaceutical refills and prescription adaptations. Permits a pharmacist to prescribe certain devices or supplies approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration. Provides that if a pharmacist prescribes certain devices or supplies, the pharmacist must provide the patient with a written advance beneficiary notice that is signed by the patient and that states that the patient may not be eligible for reimbursement for the device or supply. Requires that the pharmacy must keep a copy of the patient's advance beneficiary notice. Changes the role of a supervising physician for a physician assistant to that of a collaborating physician. Removes prescribing requirement language of at least 30 contact hours in pharmacology by a program approved by the committee and requires the physician assistant to have graduated from an accredited physician assistant program and have received the required pharmacology training from the program. Removes the following requirements concerning prescribing by a physician assistant: (1) A physician assistant prescribing a controlled substance to have practiced as a physician assistant for at least 1,800 hours. (2) Prescribing authority being delegated to a physician assistant to be expressly delegated in writing by the physician. (3) Limiting the amount prescribed to an amount not to exceed a 30 day supply. Removes a requirement that a physician review at least 25% of the patient's records in a physician assistant's first year of practice. Requires the review of at least 10% of the patient records concerning the prescribing or administering of a drug (instead of only certain scheduled drugs) for the first year in which a physician assistant obtains authority to prescribe a drug. Removes certain chart review requirements and a statement to the board by the physician.
Title
Pharmacists; physician assistants. Sets out the conditions for emergency pharmaceutical refills and prescription adaptations. Permits a pharmacist to prescribe certain devices or supplies approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration. Provides that if a pharmacist prescribes certain devices or supplies, the pharmacist must provide the patient with a written advance beneficiary notice that is signed by the patient and that states that the patient may not be eligible for reimbursement for the device or supply. Requires that the pharmacy must keep a copy of the patient's advance beneficiary notice. Changes the role of a supervising physician for a physician assistant to that of a collaborating physician. Removes prescribing requirement language of at least 30 contact hours in pharmacology by a program approved by the committee and requires the physician assistant to have graduated from an accredited physician assistant program and have received the required pharmacology training from the program. Removes the following requirements concerning prescribing by a physician assistant: (1) A physician assistant prescribing a controlled substance to have practiced as a physician assistant for at least 1,800 hours. (2) Prescribing authority being delegated to a physician assistant to be expressly delegated in writing by the physician. (3) Limiting the amount prescribed to an amount not to exceed a 30 day supply. Removes a requirement that a physician review at least 25% of the patient's records in a physician assistant's first year of practice. Requires the review of at least 10% of the patient records concerning the prescribing or administering of a drug (instead of only certain scheduled drugs) for the first year in which a physician assistant obtains authority to prescribe a drug. Removes certain chart review requirements and a statement to the board by the physician.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | House | Public Law 247 |
2019-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 474: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 387: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker and Grooms |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-28 | House | Representative Fleming added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Davisson |