IN HB1248 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to committee on Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Urban farming. Requires the state department of agriculture to develop and promote programs in support of urban farming, food cooperatives, and farmers' markets. Establishes the local farm and food council (council) to study certain topics concerning the growth of an Indiana based local farm and food product economy and make recommendations to the department of agriculture (department). Allows the department to implement the council's recommendations. Establishes the Indiana farm and food fund. Establishes a farm commodities and market news service, including a pilot program, within the department, to be funded from the livestock industry promotion and development fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban farming. Requires the state department of agriculture to develop and promote programs in support of urban farming, food cooperatives, and farmers' markets. Establishes the local farm and food council (council) to study certain topics concerning the growth of an Indiana based local farm and food product economy and make recommendations to the department of agriculture (department). Allows the department to implement the council's recommendations. Establishes the Indiana farm and food fund. Establishes a farm commodities and market news service, including a pilot program, within the department, to be funded from the livestock industry promotion and development fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Agriculture
2015-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-17HouseSenator Leising added as cosponsor
2015-02-17HouseSenator Taylor added as cosponsor
2015-02-17HouseSenator Banks A added as third sponsor
2015-02-17HouseSenator Head added as second sponsor
2015-02-17HouseSenator Merritt added as sponsor
2015-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 89, nays 5
2015-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-05HouseRepresentative Judy added as coauthor
2015-01-13HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2015-01-13HouseCoauthored by Representatives Arnold L and Shackleford
2015-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Moed

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback