IN HB1247 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child fatality reporting. Requires the state child fatality review coordinator to provide to each local child fatality review team a data collection form for reporting data regarding child fatalities. Specifies additional information that must be included in the department of child services' annual report regarding child fatalities that are the result of abuse or neglect.
Title
Child fatality reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 76 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 328: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 301: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senator Donato added as cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Koch |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon, Rogers, Ford J.D. |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-26 | House | Representative Vermilion A added as coauthor |
2022-01-26 | House | Representatives Jackson and Ledbetter C added as coauthors |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lauer |