IN HB1246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Auto dealer services. Amends the definition of the term "manufacturer" to exclude off-road vehicle manufacturers. Amends the term "transport operator" to remove Indiana dealers. Adds transport operators to the term "dealer owner". Defines the term "watercraft dealer". Provides that certain restrictions of use and the required displays of license plates do not apply to tractors, dump trucks, trucks with a rear-mounted forklift, or trucks with a mechanism to carry a rear-mounted forklift or implement. Provides the manner in which transport operators are to replace license plates or registration cards. Reorganizes and amends the transport operator license plate statutes. Provides that the motor vehicle sales advisory board shall be made up of at least six but not more than 11 persons appointed by the governor upon the recommendation of the secretary of state. Establishes that the majority of the current members of the motor vehicle sales advisory board constitutes a quorum for doing business. Provides that offsite sales do not include: (1) manufactured homes within manufactured home communities; (2) manufactured homes already located within manufactured home communities or to be installed in a manufactured home community; and (3) sales made by a dealer that owns and operates a manufactured home community. Establishes that a franchisor is not considered to be competing unfairly or in violation of the law if operating: (1) a business for less than two years; (2) in a bona fide retail operation that is for sale to any qualified independent person at a fair and reasonable price; or (3) in a bona fide relationship in which an independent person has made a significant investment subject to loss in the business operation and can reasonably expect to acquire majority ownership or managerial control of the business on reasonable terms and conditions. Provides that the secretary of state may condition or limit a dealer license, transport operator, or endorsement application if it is in the best interest of the public. Establishes certain requirements for transport operators. Provides that a dealer that is injured by an unfair practice may file a request for declaratory judgment. Makes certain changes to the expiration dates for dealer license plates. Provides that dealers may deliver a motor vehicle to a location other than the dealer's licensed location under certain conditions.
Title
Auto dealer services.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Public Law 182 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 387: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Austin added as author |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Sullivan removed as author |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Austin removed as coauthor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second sponsor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 50: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Austin |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Sullivan |