IN HB1246 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides an exemption to the Indiana state museum and historic sites corporation (corporation) from the law concerning certain public works contracts, policies, and practices. Provides that the corporation is subject to an annual compliance audit by the state board of accounts. (Current law requires a biennial audit.) Provides that the corporation is subject to certain public works requirements. Adds authority for the corporation's board to improve, encumber, transfer, and convey historic property. Allows the corporation's board to designate an existing nonprofit corporation to solicit and accept private funding. Provides that the Indiana state museum foundation is subject to an annual compliance audit by the state board of accounts. (Current law requires an annual audit.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana state museum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-23 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 166
2013-05-07HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 566: yeas 91, nays 5
2013-03-19SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-03-18SenateAmendment 1 (Arnold), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-14SenateSenator Merritt added as cosponsor
2013-03-05SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-04SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2013-02-11HouseRepresentative Pierce added as coauthor
2013-02-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Arnold and Mishler
2013-02-11HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 92, nays 4
2013-02-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-05HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2013-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback