IN HB1244 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unemployment hearings and appeals. Provides that, in unemployment appeals, the proceedings before an administrative law judge are de novo. Provides that an administrative law judge, review board member, or other individual who adjudicates claims can consider as evidence and include in the record those records of the department of workforce development (department) that are material to the issues being considered in the hearing if the records are made available to the interested parties prior to the hearing through (1) the United States mail or (2) the department's electronic portal. Removes the provision that provides that the department shall define the term "effort to secure full-time work". Provides that an individual has made an effort to secure full-time work with respect to any week in which the individual has completed certain activities directed by the department and affirmed that the individual has made an effort to secure full-time work. Requires the department, not later than December 31, 2021, to adopt rules to define (1) the acceptable types of work search activities, (2) the number of work search activities required to be completed in any week, (3) the requirements for producing documentation, and (4) the requirement to apply to, and accept if offered, suitable jobs referred by the department. Provides that 646 IAC 5-9-3 is void and directs the publisher of the Indiana Administrative Code and the Indiana Register to remove the section from the Indiana Administrative Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment hearings and appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 119
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 323: yeas 87, nays 0
2020-03-04HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSenator Perfect added as second sponsor
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #4 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #2 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Boots
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 89, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2020-01-13HouseCoauthored by Representative Leonard
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Vermilion

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1244/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/9/9/fd997fbf/HB1244.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/f/b/0ffbff93/HB1244.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/4/d/924d61bb/HB1244.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/9/e/509ec864/HB1244.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/1/c/b31c4878/HB1244.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/6/3/2963c51a/HB1244.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/5/d/b25da5ae/HB1244.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/2/8/62283b68/HB1244.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/4/9/644952cf/HB1244.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/6/3/1263edbe/HB1244.166_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/c/6/43c66af2/HB1244.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/2/8/c128cf7c/HB1244.303_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/5/7/e4574f99/HB1244.323_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback