IN HB1240 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Levees. Provides that a county may pay the costs incurred by a committee in charge of a levee for maintenance or repairs on a levee and later be reimbursed through the assessment of the land benefited by the maintenance or repairs. (Current law requires that the county pay the costs of maintenance or repairs on a levee and later be reimbursed through the assessment of the land benefited by the maintenance or repairs.) Allows a committee in charge of a levee to raise the necessary money to pay the cost of maintenance or repairs on a levee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levees. Provides that a county may pay the costs incurred by a committee in charge of a levee for maintenance or repairs on a levee and later be reimbursed through the assessment of the land benefited by the maintenance or repairs. (Current law requires that the county pay the costs of maintenance or repairs on a levee and later be reimbursed through the assessment of the land benefited by the maintenance or repairs.) Allows a committee in charge of a levee to raise the necessary money to pay the cost of maintenance or repairs on a levee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Natural Resources
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2015-02-10HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-09HouseSenator Bassler added as sponsor
2015-02-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 95, nays 2
2015-02-05HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-02HouseRepresentatives Ubelhor, Aylesworth, Kersey added as coauthors
2015-02-02HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-13HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2015-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Braun M

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback