IN HB1239 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various changes to the laws concerning: (1) financial institutions; (2) debt management companies; (3) pawnbrokers; (4) money transmitters; (5) check cashers; (6) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; (7) first lien mortgage lenders; and (8) rental purchase agreements. Repeals the definition of "office of thrift supervision" in the statutes governing the charter conversion of a: (1) building and loan association to a stock building and loan association; (2) mutual or stock savings association to a commercial bank; (3) mutual savings association to a mutual savings bank; (4) mutual or stock savings association to a stock savings bank; and (5) mutual savings bank to a stock savings bank. Changes the statute governing savings banks: (1) to repeal the definitions of "community based economic development" and "community development corporation"; and (2) to recodify the definitions in another provision of the statute. Repeals a provision that requires a savings bank to maintain 60% of its assets in certain qualified investments under the Internal Revenue Code. Repeals a provision that: (1) concerns the effect of a revocation, suspension, or surrender of a pawnbroker license on existing pawnbroker contracts; and (2) is incorporated into another provision of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial institutions and consumer credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-01 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-02-29 Signed by the Speaker
2012-02-27 Returned to the House without amendments
2012-02-27 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 49 and nays 0
2012-02-23 Amendment 1 (Taylor), failed; voice vote
2012-02-23 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-21 Senator Taylor added as cosponsor
2012-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2012-01-30 Senate sponsors: Senators Paul and Holdman
2012-01-30 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-30 Representatives Messmer, Riecken and Pryor added as coauthors
2012-01-30 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 93, nays 1
2012-01-26 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback