IN HB1238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Breaux
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Breaux
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid reimbursement for children's hospitals. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to compile information from other states and collaborate with Medicaid directors of states bordering Indiana concerning the provision of services and reimbursement for Medicaid children recipients who receive care in states other than the state in which the recipient resides. Requires a meeting with certain stakeholders before October 1, 2019, and sets forth requirements of the meeting. Requires the office to update the house public health committee and the senate health and provider services committee concerning the office's progress. Allows the office to apply to the United States Department of Health and Human Services for a program or procedure: (1) concerning the provision of Medicaid services and Medicaid reimbursement for Indiana Medicaid children recipients who receive care in children's hospitals or Medicaid services from providers located in a state that borders Indiana; and (2) that was developed with the stakeholders.
Title
Medicaid reimbursement for children's hospitals. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to compile information from other states and collaborate with Medicaid directors of states bordering Indiana concerning the provision of services and reimbursement for Medicaid children recipients who receive care in states other than the state in which the recipient resides. Requires a meeting with certain stakeholders before October 1, 2019, and sets forth requirements of the meeting. Requires the office to update the house public health committee and the senate health and provider services committee concerning the office's progress. Allows the office to apply to the United States Department of Health and Human Services for a program or procedure: (1) concerning the provision of Medicaid services and Medicaid reimbursement for Indiana Medicaid children recipients who receive care in children's hospitals or Medicaid services from providers located in a state that borders Indiana; and (2) that was developed with the stakeholders.
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Mara Reardon [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Breaux |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Tallian |
2019-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Brown T and Hamilton |
2019-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Soliday and Candelaria Reardon |
2019-04-18 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 482: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second sponsor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2019-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-15 | House | Representatives Huston and Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |