IN HB1236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Political activity on homeowners association property. Provides that the statute that prohibits a homeowners association from adopting or enforcing a rule or covenant that prohibits candidates and officeholders from entering the property to conduct political activity does not apply to homeowners association property if: (1) access to the property from the outside is controlled; and (2) the common areas, including roads and sidewalks, are privately owned and maintained.
Title
Political activity on homeowners association property. Provides that the statute that prohibits a homeowners association from adopting or enforcing a rule or covenant that prohibits candidates and officeholders from entering the property to conduct political activity does not apply to homeowners association property if: (1) access to the property from the outside is controlled; and (2) the common areas, including roads and sidewalks, are privately owned and maintained.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Slager [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 174 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 549: yeas 40, nays 8 |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 569: yeas 70, nays 26 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senator Merritt removed as advisor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as conferee |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senator Lanane removed as conferee |
2015-04-27 | House | Representative Smith M added as conferee |
2015-04-27 | House | Representative Smith M removed as advisor |
2015-04-27 | House | Representative Bartlett removed as conferee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Merritt, Taylor and Yoder |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Banks A and Lanane |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-14 | House | House Advisors appointed: Olthoff, Smith M and Lawson L |
2015-04-14 | House | House Conferees appointed: Slager and Bartlett |
2015-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 347: yeas 42, nays 6 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Elections |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Niemeyer added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 70, nays 28 |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative Smith, M. added as coauthor |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2015-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative Olthoff |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Slager |