IN HB1234 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires county treasurers to mail property tax statements at least 15 business days, instead of 15 calendar days, before the first payment is due. Provides that an employee of an assessor's office or an appraiser may not serve as a voting member of the property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA) in the county where the individual is employed. Allows a county fiscal body to waive certification requirements for certain members of the PTABOA appointed by the fiscal body. Provides that a school corporation with a majority of its property tax levies imposed in LaPorte County may, before September 1, 2014, transfer from the school corporation's debt service fund to the school corporation's rainy day fund a total amount equal to not more than 20% of the school corporation's 2014 certified debt service fund budget. Establishes assessor, appraiser, and tax representative standards of conduct. Establishes a certification appeal board to conduct appeals brought by assessors and employees of assessors whose certifications are revoked by the department of local government finance.
Title
Property tax matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 123403 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 123401 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 123403 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 123401 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 514: yeas 97 and nays 1 |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 134 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 466: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hume added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Pete Miller added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Clere added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Ober added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Kersey added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Thompson added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 317: yeas 35 and nays 12 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HB 1234 Amendment #1 (Miller, Pete), prevailed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Ober added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Pete Miller added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 194: yeas 63 and nays 27 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1234 Amendment #7 (GiaQuinta), failed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1234 Amendment #6 (GiaQuinta), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1234 Amendment #2 (Thompson), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1234 Amendment #5 (Thompson), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1234 Amendment #4 (Thompson), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Clere |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Thompson. |