IN HB1230 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Safe haven 911. Provides that due to extenuating circumstances, if a child's parent or a person is unable to give up custody of a child under the procedure set forth in Indiana's safe haven law, the child's parent or the person may request that an emergency medical services provider (provider) take custody of the child by: (1) dialing the 911 emergency call number; and (2) staying with the child until a provider arrives to take custody of the child. Provides that the emergency medical dispatch agency or the provider shall inform the child's parent or the person giving up custody of the child of the ability to remain anonymous. Provides that a provider, shall, without a court order, take custody of a child who is, or who appears to be, not more than 30 days of age if the child is voluntarily left: (1) in a newborn safety device that is located at an emergency medical services station; or (2) with medical staff after delivery in a hospital or other medical facility when the child's parent notifies the medical staff that the parent is voluntarily relinquishing the child. Allows a child's parent to remain anonymous if the child is voluntarily relinquished in a hospital or other medical facility after delivery of the child. Provides that an emergency medical services station is immune from civil liability for an act or omission relating to the operation of the newborn safety device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe haven 911.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HousePublic Law 105
2021-04-22HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 305: yeas 88, nays 0
2021-03-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-16SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2021-03-16SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-15SenateSenator Walker G added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-09SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseCosponsor: Senator Houchin
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Holdman, Grooms, Koch
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 92, nays 0
2021-02-01HouseRepresentatives Frye, Snow C, Bauer M added as coauthors
2021-02-01HouseAmendment #1 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Lauer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1230/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/e/2/59e2b1ab/HB1230.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/e/4/e5e44924/HB1230.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/f/9/a2f92311/HB1230.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/0/f/800f93e3/HB1230.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/7/7/f1778ac9/HB1230.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/a/4/e2a4db0e/HB1230.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/6/5/c46552fd/HB1230.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/4/e/9c4e341a/HB1230.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/f/c/0efc0536/HB1230.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/d/f/1fdf2497/HB1230.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/6/d/d26de78d/HB1230.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/6/4/d4643d18/HB1230.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/3/b/2f3b9241/HB1230.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/f/1/9bf13d91/HB1230.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/d/9/b3d9c5f6/HB1230.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/5/3/14537fff/HB1230.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/2/6/3926d388/HB1230.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/f/c/40fca13a/HB1230.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/0/9/b1092104/HB1230.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/d/8/bbd88561/HB1230.04.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/8/5/c68593fa/HB1230.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/a/032a3a14/HB1230.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/2/8/c9283581/HB1230.48_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/7/8/1778b1f9/HB1230.03.ENGH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/a/f/70af766f/HB1230.232_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/f/5/4ff562c9/HB1230.305_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback