IN HB1228 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Data concerning youth in adult court. Requires the criminal justice institute to: (1) track certain information concerning juveniles under the jurisdiction of an adult court due to a juvenile court not having jurisdiction; (2) track certain information concerning waivers of juvenile court jurisdiction; and (3) publish the information annually.
Title
Data concerning youth in adult court. Requires the criminal justice institute to: (1) track certain information concerning juveniles under the jurisdiction of an adult court due to a juvenile court not having jurisdiction; (2) track certain information concerning waivers of juvenile court jurisdiction; and (3) publish the information annually.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Public Law 142 |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2018-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 346: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second sponsor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Head |
2018-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Representatives Bartels and Pierce added as coauthors |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |